There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dollars to the Classroom Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide dollars to the classroom.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/20/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/22/2001Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/12/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/22/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform07/20/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1944.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1944. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2001)

Dollars to the Classroom Act - Authorizes the Secretary of Education award grants to States for use by States and local educational agencies (LEAs) to improve classroom services and activities for students. Prescribes requirements for participation of private school children and teachers in activities and services. Prohibits Federal control of State or local educational activities or services receiving such grant assistance.

Repeals specified programs under the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (ESEA) and certain other Acts, including: (1) demonstrations of innovative practices; (2) innovative elementary school transition projects; (3) Dwight D. Eisenhower Professional Development Program;(4) Technology for Education, including Star Schools, Ready-to-Learn Television, and the telecommunications demonstration project for mathematics; (5) Magnet Schools Assistance; (6) Women's Educational Equity; (7) Innovative Education Program Strategies; (8) Native Hawaiians Education; (9) Alaska Native Education; (10) Fund for the Improvement of Education; (11) Gifted and Talented Education; (12) Arts in Education; (13) Civic Education; (14) Allen J. Ellender Fellowship Program (Close-Up programs); (15) 21st Century Community Learning Centers; (16) Urban and Rural Education Assistance; (17) National Writing Project; (18) Extended Time for Learning and Longer School Year; (19) Comprehensive Regional Assistance Centers; (20) Eisenhower Math and Science Regional Consortia; (21) State and local education systemic improvement; (22) school-to-work opportunities system development and implementation grants; and (23) Education for Homeless Children program.

Education Flexibility Partnership Demonstration Act - Authorizes the Secretary to allow all 50 States to participate in the Education Flexibility Partnership Demonstration Act program.