Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/12/2001