Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/17/2002