Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/22/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/21/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/21/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/11/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/17/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/04/2001