Committees: H.R.1954 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/23/2001 Referred to
06/20/2001 Markup by
06/22/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-107,Part 1
House Financial Services05/23/2001 Referred to
07/16/2001 Discharged from
House Ways and Means05/23/2001 Referred to
07/12/2001 Markup by
07/16/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-107,Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/04/2001 Referred to
07/10/2001 Discharged from
House Government Reform05/23/2001 Referred to
07/16/2001 Discharged from
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology and Procurement Policy06/06/2001 Referred to