Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/07/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 12/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/23/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2002