Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2002