Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/29/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/11/2002