Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/18/2002