Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/21/2002