Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 05/23/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/05/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/27/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/19/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/19/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/19/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/19/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/04/2001