Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/05/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/12/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/19/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/18/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/01/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/03/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/06/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/23/2002