Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2002