Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/18/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/18/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/21/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/16/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/16/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/19/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/20/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/26/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/26/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/31/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/10/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/16/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/09/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew