Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/16/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/18/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/18/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/23/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/25/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/26/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/26/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/26/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/26/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/30/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/12/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/17/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/18/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/25/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/09/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/12/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew