Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/19/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/11/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/12/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/12/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/02/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/02/2001