Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/26/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/2002