Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/24/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/06/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/06/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/06/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/13/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/24/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/21/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/14/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/17/2002