Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/24/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/25/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/10/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/10/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/10/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/16/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/16/2002