Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/21/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/26/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/14/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/04/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/13/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/09/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/09/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/25/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/08/2002