Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/20/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/20/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/20/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/20/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/20/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/20/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/20/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/30/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/30/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/30/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/30/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/30/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/21/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/05/2002