Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/12/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/20/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/28/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/17/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/17/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/17/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/17/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/01/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 08/01/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/01/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 08/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 08/02/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/02/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/13/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/10/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/13/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/13/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/13/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/13/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/13/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/13/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/13/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/13/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/13/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/13/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/13/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/13/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew