Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/07/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/27/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/30/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/30/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/30/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/30/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/30/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/09/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/08/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/15/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/25/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/11/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/21/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/31/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/31/2002