Committees: H.R.2037 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/25/2001 Referred to
09/25/2002 Markup by
10/07/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-727,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection06/08/2001 Referred to
04/18/2002 Hearings by
05/09/2002 Markup by
05/09/2002 Reported by
House Judiciary05/25/2001 Referred to
10/02/2002 Markup by
10/08/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-727,Part 2