There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sudan Peace Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Sudan Peace Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Sudan Peace Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate famine relief efforts and a comprehensive solution to the war in Sudan.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/13/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 422 - 2 (Roll no. 160).(text: CR H3106-3107)
06/08/2001Committee on Financial Services discharged.
06/08/2001Reported by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 107-92, Part I.
06/05/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
06/21/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
06/14/2001SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/13/2001-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2001-2:59pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 422 - 2 (Roll no. 160). (text: CR H3106-3107)
06/13/2001-2:35pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
06/13/2001-2:35pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/13/2001-2:35pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2052.
06/13/2001-2:35pmHouseH.Amdt.77 On agreeing to the Bachus amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
06/13/2001-2:00pmHouseDEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with debate on the Bachus amendment under the five-minute rule.
06/13/2001-1:59pmHouseH.Amdt.77 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Bachus. (consideration: CR H3107-3113; text: CR H3107)
06/13/2001-1:10pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2052.
06/13/2001-1:10pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 162 and Rule XXIII.
06/13/2001-1:10pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
06/13/2001-1:09pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2052 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
06/13/2001-1:09pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 162. (consideration: CR H3098-3113; text of measure as reported in House: CR H3106-3107)
06/13/2001-1:09pmHouseRule H. Res. 162 passed House.
06/12/2001-6:35pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 162 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2052 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
06/08/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
06/08/2001HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
06/08/2001HouseHouse Committee on Financial Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 8, 2001.
06/08/2001HouseReported by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 107-92, Part I.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/07/2001HouseMr. Portman asked unanimous consent that the Committee on International Relations have until 5:00 p.m. on June 8 to file a report on H.R. 2052. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/06/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/06/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/05/2001HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/05/2001HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/05/2001HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/05/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/05/2001 Referred to
06/06/2001 Markup by
06/08/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-92
House Financial Services06/05/2001 Referred to
06/08/2001 Discharged from
Senate Foreign Relations06/21/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2052. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/13/2001)

Sudan Peace Act - Declares that Congress condemns violations of human rights on all sides of the conflict in Sudan (including the Government of Sudan), the ongoing slave trade there, the Government's use and organization of "murahalliin" (or "mujahadeen"), Popular Defense Forces (PDF), and regular Sudanese Army units into raiding and slaving parties in Bahr al Ghazal, the Nuba Mountains, Upper Nile, and Blue Nile regions, and its aerial bombardment of civilian targets. Recognizes that the use of raiding and slaving parties is a tool for creating food shortages as a systematic means to destroy the societies, culture, and economies of the Dinka, Nuer, and Nuba peoples in a policy of low-intensity ethnic cleansing.

(Sec. 5) Urges the President to make certain funds available for humanitarian assistance to the National Democratic Alliance.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the Secretary of State to utilize Department of State personnel for the support of ongoing negotiations, and eventual implementation of a peace settlement, between the Government of Sudan and opposition forces.

(Sec. 7) Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United Nations (UN) should be used as a tool to facilitate peace and recovery in Sudan; and (2) the President should seek to end the Government of Sudan's veto power over relief flight plans, to investigate the practice of slavery in Sudan, and to sponsor a condemnation of the Government of Sudan each time it subjects civilians to aerial bombardment.

(Sec. 8) Prohibits business entities engaged in commercial activities in Sudan from trading their securities in any U.S. capital market unless they make public disclosure of their activities in Sudan.

(Sec. 9) Directs the President to exercise his authorities under the International Emergency Economic Powers Act to prohibit any entity engaged in the development of oil or gas in Sudan from: (1) raising capital in the United States; or (2) trading its securities (or depository receipts with respect to its securities) in any U.S. capital market.

(Sec. 10) Requires the Secretary of State to report to the appropriate congressional committees on the conflict in Sudan.

(Sec. 11) Declares the sense of Congress that the President should continue to increase the use of non-OLS agencies in relief supply distribution in southern Sudan. Requires the President to submit a progress report to the appropriate congressional committees.

(Sec. 12) Directs the President to develop a contingency plan to provide, outside UN auspices, the greatest amount of U.S. Government and privately donated relief to all affected areas in Sudan, including the Nuba Mountains, Upper Nile, and the Blue Nile regions, in the event the Government of Sudan imposes a ban on Operation Lifeline Sudan air transport relief flights. Authorizes the President to reprogram up to 100 percent of funds for OLS operations for purposes of such contingency plan.

(Sec. 13) Directs the Secretary to collect and report to specified congressional committees on information about possible war crimes by all parties to the conflict in Sudan, including slavery, rape, and aerial bombardment of civilian targets.