Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/14/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/21/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/21/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/30/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/25/2002