Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2002