There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Early Treatment for HIV Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to permit States the option to provide Medicaid coverage for low-income individuals infected with HIV.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/05/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/05/2001Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (152)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/05/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/05/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/13/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/31/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/31/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/31/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/31/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/08/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/24/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/26/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/07/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/07/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/05/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/18/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2063.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2063. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/05/2001)

Early Treatment for HIV Act of 2001 - Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to give States the option of providing Medicaid coverage for certain low-income HIV-infected individuals.