Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/09/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/12/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/15/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/17/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/17/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/15/2002