Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/06/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/27/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/18/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/18/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/26/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/30/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2001