Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/07/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/20/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/25/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/18/2002