Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/21/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/21/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 08/02/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 08/02/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/29/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/29/2002