Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/07/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/12/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/28/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/12/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/20/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/20/2002