Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/12/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/12/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 12/20/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 12/20/2001