Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/19/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/19/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/11/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/11/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/11/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/11/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/18/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/18/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/05/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/10/2001