There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission for the purpose of encouraging and providing for the commemoration of the 50th anniversary of the Supreme Court decision in Brown v. Board of Education.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
09/18/2001Became Public Law No: 107-41. (TXT | PDF)
09/18/2001Signed by President.
09/14/2001Presented to President.
09/10/2001Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H5465)
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9004-9005; text as passed Senate: CR S9004-9005)
08/02/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
06/27/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2 (Roll no. 198).(text as House agreed to: CR H3635-3636)
06/12/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/18/2001Became Public Law No: 107-41. (TXT | PDF)
09/18/2001Signed by President.
09/14/2001HousePresented to President.
09/10/2001-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/10/2001-2:49pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H5465)
09/10/2001-2:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
09/10/2001-2:39pmHouseMr. Davis, Tom moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H5465-5467)
09/05/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9004-9005; text as passed Senate: CR S9004-9005)
08/02/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/28/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/27/2001-1:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2001-1:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2 (Roll no. 198). (text as House agreed to: CR H3635-3636)
06/27/2001-1:41pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3645-3646)
06/27/2001-12:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/27/2001-11:59amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2133.
06/27/2001-11:59amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3635-3641)
06/27/2001-11:59amHouseMrs. Morella moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/12/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
06/12/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform06/12/2001 Referred to
Senate Judiciary06/28/2001 Referred to
08/02/2001 Markup by
08/02/2001 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2133. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/03/2001)

Establishes the Brown v. Board of Education 50th Anniversary Commission to commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Supreme Court decision in Oliver L. Brown et al. v. Board of Education of Topeka, Kansas et al.

Authorizes appropriations.