Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/12/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/18/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/19/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/26/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/06/2001