There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nutrition Assistance for Working Families and Seniors Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food Stamp Act of 1977 to improve nutrition assistance for working families and the elderly, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/12/2001Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2001Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2001Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/12/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/19/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/31/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/31/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/31/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/02/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/12/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/12/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/12/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2002
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2001 04/25/2002 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture06/12/2001 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry06/18/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary06/12/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims06/18/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2142.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2142. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2001)

Nutrition Assistance for Working Families and Seniors Act of 2001 - Amends the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 to make legal immigrants eligible for food stamp program benefits.

Amends the Food Stamp Act of 1977 respecting the food stamp program to: (1) increase standard income deductions; (2) increase the minimum household allotment; (3) increase the transitional benefits period; (4) provide for personnel training, a toll-free information number, pilot programs for inter-program application and verification, and Internet and telephone participation; (5) provide grants for partnerships and technology to enhance program access, including outreach to families with low program participation, or participating in (or unable to participate in) the temporary assistance for needy families program.

Amends the Emergency Food Assistance Act of 1983 to authorize additional appropriations for emergency food assistance commodities.