There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

Estate Tax bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Permanent Death Tax Repeal Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Permanent Death Tax Repeal Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make the repeal of the estate tax permanent.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 256 - 171 (Roll no. 219).(text: CR H3249)
06/12/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/10/2002SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 411.
06/07/2002SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
06/06/2002-4:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/06/2002-4:53pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 256 - 171 (Roll no. 219). (text: CR H3249)
06/06/2002-4:44pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 205 - 223 (Roll no. 218). (text: CR H3274)
06/06/2002-4:25pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
06/06/2002-4:14pmHouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Stenholm motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment adding a new section which provides that any tax reduction in the bill be contingent on not raiding Social Security funds.
06/06/2002-4:14pmHouseMr. Stenholm moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H3274-3276)
06/06/2002-4:13pmHouseH.Amdt.502 On agreeing to the Pomeroy amendment (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 231 (Roll no. 217).
06/06/2002-3:50pmHouseH.Amdt.502 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) and on the bill, without objection.
06/06/2002-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the Pomeroy amendment in the nature of a substitute.
06/06/2002-2:37pmHouseH.Amdt.502 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Pomeroy. (consideration: CR H3262-3274; text: CR H3262-3263)
06/06/2002-1:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2143.
06/06/2002-1:17pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2143 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
06/06/2002-1:17pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 435. (consideration: CR H3249-3276)
06/06/2002-1:17pmHouseRule H. Res. 435 passed House.
06/05/2002-4:34pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 435 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2143 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
06/12/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/12/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/12/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/17/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/05/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means06/12/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2143. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/06/2002)

Permanent Death Tax Repeal Act of 2002 - Amends title IX (Compliance with Congressional Budget Act) of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001 (P.L. 107-16) to repeal the sunset provisions applicable to title V (Estate, Gift, and Generation-Skipping Transfer Taxes) of such Act. (Makes estate tax repeal permanent.)

States that such amendments shall take effect as if included in section 901 of such Act.