Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/20/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/17/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/06/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/26/2002