Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/27/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/12/2002