Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/28/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/23/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/30/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/30/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/10/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 12/20/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/26/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/28/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/05/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/23/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/07/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/09/2002