There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Environmental Responsibility Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to require the Department of Defense and all other defense-related agencies of the United States to fully comply with Federal and State environmental laws, including certain laws relating to public health and worker safety, that are designed to protect the environment and the health and safety of the public, particularly those persons most vulnerable to the hazards incident to military operations and installations, such as children, members of the Armed Forces, civilian employees, and persons living in the vicinity of military operations and installations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/13/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date
12/06/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
12/06/2001Executive Comment Requested from DOD, DOE.
08/20/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/16/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/25/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/14/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/13/2001 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Readiness12/06/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/13/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials06/25/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/13/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment06/14/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation06/14/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation06/14/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit06/14/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/14/2001 Referred to
House Resources06/13/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce06/13/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections08/20/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary06/13/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law07/16/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2154.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2154. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/13/2001)

Military Environmental Responsibility Act - Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) and defense-related agencies (the Department of Energy, the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, the Office of Naval Nuclear Reactors, and any others as designated by the President) to fully comply with designated Federal and State environmental laws, including those related to public health and safety, to the same extent as any other entities subject to such laws. Waives any immunity of the United States with respect to such laws as applied to DOD and any defense-related agency. Provides for administrative enforcement actions.

Requires the Secretary of Defense , for each weapon system for which congressional budget justification is required, to ensure that all development and procurement decisions comply with the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969.

Repeals: (1) a Federal provision prohibiting the use of certain military appropriation accounts for the payment of fines and penalties for environmental noncompliance; and (2) a provision of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2000 which prohibits the use of defense funds to conduct treatment, storage, or disposal activities at sites designated under the Formerly Utilized Site Remedial Action Program.