Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/17/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/05/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/24/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/26/2002