Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/12/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/12/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/12/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/02/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/12/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/16/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/07/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/19/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/06/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/27/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/06/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/26/2002