Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/27/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/13/2001