Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/13/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/13/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/10/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/07/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/16/2001