Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/23/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/23/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 08/01/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/06/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/12/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/07/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/04/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/09/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/19/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/27/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/13/2002