Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/14/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/26/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/26/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/27/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/16/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/16/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/16/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/2001