Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/14/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/14/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/23/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/25/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/25/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/11/2001